# Maths Multiplication Shortcut: Multiplication by 99

Maths Multiplication Shortcut: Multiplication by 99 Tips and Tricks: Step 1: Multiply the given number by 100. Step 2: Next, subtract  the given number from  the result obtained in step 1 to get the required answer.  Example 1:  Find 46 × 99   Example 2:  Find 132 × 99 Now, try the following questions:  Read More ...

# Maths Multiplication shortcut: Multiplication by 9

Maths Multiplication shortcut: Multiplication by 9 Tips and Tricks: Step 1: Multiply the given number by 10. Step 2: Next, subtract  the given number from  the result obtained in step 1 to get the required answer.  Example 1:  Find 56 × 9 Example 2:  Find 134 × 9 Now, try the following questions:   49 Read More ...

# Maths Multiplication Shortcut: Multiplication by 5

Maths Multiplication Shortcut: Multiplication by 5 Tips and Tricks: Step 1: Multiply the given number by 10. Step 2: Now divide the result obtained in step 1 by  2 to get your answer.  Example 1:  Find 98 × 5 Example 2:  Find 523 × 5   Now, try the following questions:  68× 5 467 × Read More ...

# Maths Multiplication shortcut: Multiplication by 11

Maths Multiplication shortcut: Multiplication by 11 Tips and Tricks: Step 1: Write the rightmost digit of the given number down. Step 2:  Add each pair of digits(right to left) and write the results down. (Where necessary, carry digits right to left). Step 3: Finally, write down the left most digit (If necessary, add any final carry). Read More ...

# Maths Multiplication Shortcut: Multiplication by 15

Maths Multiplication Shortcut: Multiplication by 15 Tips and Tricks: Step 1: Multiply the given number by 3. Step 2: Next, divide the result obtained in step 1 by  2. Step 3: Now, multiply the result obtained in step 2 by 10 to get the required answer. Example 1:  Find 18 × 15 Example 2:  Find 46 × 15 Read More ...

# Maths Multiplication Shortcut: Multiplication by 125

Maths Multiplication Shortcut: Multiplication by 125 Tips and Tricks: Step 1:  Multiply the given number by 1000. Step 2: Now divide the result obtained in step 1 by  8 to get your answer. Example 1:  Find 32 × 125   Example 2:  Find 342 × 125 Now, try the following questions:  287 × 125 4678 × 125 Read More ...

# Interesting Maths Facts: Cube of a Number

Interesting Maths Facts: Cube of a Number 1729 is the smallest number that can be expressed as the sum of two cubes in two different ways. 1729 = 1728 + 1 = 123 + 13 1729 = 1000 + 729 = 103 + 93 1 and 8 are the only two single-digit cube numbers. The Read More ...

# Interesting Maths Facts: Googol

Interesting Maths Facts: Googol A googol is a number equal to 1 followed by 100 zeros or 10100. In the late 1930s, Edward Kasner, an American mathematician, was working with a very large numbers. He asked his 9-year old nephew what might he call this number, written as 10100. His nephew named it  googol. Interestingly, Read More ...

# Maths Quiz

Maths Quiz: Use +, - x, / , to make the given sentence true: 523 ___ 17___ 32161___29___10000 = 0